19.06.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] |
12.09.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] |
11.02.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.03.2005 [2005/13] |
10.09.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] |
18.06.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 04.08.2004 [2004/32] |
06.02.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2004 [2004/13] |
28.06.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.08.2003 [2003/33] |
19.06.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.02.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.12.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
27.11.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.11.2002 |
Change - representative |
published on 08.01.2003 [2003/02] |
03.09.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
30.08.2002 |
First examination report |
|
27.08.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.11.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.08.2001 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
09.08.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.07.2001 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
28.12.2000 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
07.02.2000 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
07.02.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.01.2000 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
26.01.1999 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
26.01.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.01.1999 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
24.07.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.09.1998 [1998/37] |
08.05.1998 |
Publication of search report |
published on 24.06.1998 [1998/26] |
09.04.1998 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.05.1998 [1998/22] |
09.04.1998 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.05.1998 [1998/22] |
22.08.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.10.1997 [1997/41] |