EP0799779 - Distributing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hans Lingl Anlagenbau und Verfahrenstechnik GmbH & Co. KG Albrecht-Berblinger-Strasse 6 D-89231 Neu-Ulm / DE | [1997/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simmen, Klaus Im Wiesengrund 14 89257 Illertissen / DE | 02 /
Simon, Helmut Fuchsloch 7 86381 Krumbach / DE | [1997/41] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Körber, Martin Hans, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/02] | Körber, Martin, Dipl.-Phys., et al Mitscherlich & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96118507.1 | 19.11.1996 | [1997/41] | Priority number, date | DE1996112911 | 01.04.1996 Original published format: DE 19612911 | [1997/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0799779 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0799779 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | [1998/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0799779 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/84, B65G47/71 | [1998/22] | CPC: |
B65G47/841 (EP);
B65G47/71 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/41] | B65G47/71 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/41] | Title | German: | Verteileinrichtung | [1997/41] | English: | Distributing device | [1997/41] | French: | Dispositif de distribution | [1997/41] | Examination procedure | 10.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/37] | 09.07.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 30.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.01.1999 | 30.11.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   21.01.2000 | 30.11.2000 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   12.07.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 13.08.2003 | AT | 19.11.2003 | CH | 30.11.2003 | FR | 30.11.2003 | LI | 30.11.2003 | [2008/42] |
Former [2005/13] | NL | 13.08.2003 | |
AT | 19.11.2003 | ||
CH | 30.11.2003 | ||
LI | 30.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/44] | NL | 13.08.2003 | |
CH | 30.11.2003 | ||
LI | 30.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | NL | 13.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US1813130 (AHNGER YRJO A) [X] 1 * page 1, line 53 - page 4, line 109; figure - * [Y] 4; | [AY]DE1963111 (GANZHORN & STIRN) [A] 1 * page 2, line 10 - line 33; figure 1 * [Y] 2; | [A]US4273496 (PAPALEXIS GREGORY C) [A] 1 * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 44; figure 1 *; | [A]US4354590 (LANGEN MARINUS J M) [A] 1* column 3, line 9 - column 6, line 2 *; | [X]DE3141144 (KELLER GMBH & CO KG) [X] 1 * column 1, line 32 - column 3, line 8; figure - *; | [XY]DE8203977U (C. KELLER GMBH) [X] 1,3,5 * page 4, line 22 - page 6, line 15; figure - * [Y] 2,4 |