EP0752705 - Method of and apparatus for recording information on record medium, and method and apparatus for reproducing the same, and a record medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/02] | Method of and apparatus for recording information on record medium, and apparatus for reproducing the same | ||
[2004/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/02] | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tozaki, Akihiro, c/o Pioneer Electronic Corp. Sougou Kenkyusho, No. 6-1-1 Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Hiroshi, c/o Pioneer Electronic Corp. Tokorozawa Works No. 2610 Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa -shi Saitama-ken / JP | [1997/02] | Representative(s) | Downing, Michael Philip, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massett Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Downing, Michael Philip, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massett Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | ||
Former [1997/02] | Downing, Michael Philip, et al Fry Heath & Spence, The Old College, 53 High Street Horley, Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 96304936.6 | 04.07.1996 | [1997/02] | Priority number, date | JP19950170913 | 06.07.1995 Original published format: JP 17091395 | [1997/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0752705 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0752705 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | [1998/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0752705 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/30, H04N5/926, G11B27/32, G11B27/10, G11B27/034 | [1998/46] | CPC: |
H04N21/4334 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/10 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/11 (EP,US);
G11B27/3027 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
H04N21/8455 (EP,US);
H04N21/854 (EP,US);
H04N21/8547 (EP,US);
H04N5/85 (EP,US);
H04N9/8042 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2512 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2525 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US);
G11B2220/65 (EP,US);
H04N5/9262 (EP,US);
H04N9/8063 (EP,US);
H04N9/8205 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1997/02] | G11B27/30, H04N5/926 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Aufzeichnung von Daten auf einem Aufzeichnungsträger und Verfahren und Gerät zur Wiedergabe derselben, und ein Aufzeichnungsträger | [2004/06] | English: | Method of and apparatus for recording information on record medium, and method and apparatus for reproducing the same, and a record medium | [2004/06] | French: | Méthode et appareil d'enregistrement d'information sur un support d'enregistrement et méthode et appareil de reproduction de celle-ci, et un support d'enregistrement | [2004/06] |
Former [1997/02] | Verfahren und Gerät zur Aufzeichnung von Daten auf einem Aufzeichnungsträger und Gerät zur Wiedergabe derselben | ||
Former [1997/02] | Method of and apparatus for recording information on record medium, and apparatus for reproducing the same | ||
Former [1997/02] | Méthode et appareil d'enregistrement d'information sur un support d'enregistrement et appareil de reproduction de celle-ci | Examination procedure | 30.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/26] | 05.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 13.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04015204.3 / EP1460635 | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0606868 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-9,11-15 * the whole document * [A] 3,10; | [A]EP0424903 (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9407332 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0634867 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0644692 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0618695 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3,5-9,11 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP0675493 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [PA] 1-15 * the whole document * |