Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0776696
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
26.07.2002 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.09.2002 [2002/37] |
03.08.2001 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.09.2001 [2001/38] |
29.06.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.03.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
23.03.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.11.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
21.11.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.04.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
17.12.1999 |
First examination report |
|
11.12.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.12.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.11.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.03.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.04.1998 [1998/18] |
25.07.1997 |
Publication of search report |
published on 10.09.1997 [1997/37] |
18.07.1997 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.09.1997 [1997/36] |
18.04.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.06.1997 [1997/23] |