Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH09150056 | Global Dossier | 10.06.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | JP31445695 | 01.12.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0776696 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2001 | B1 | EP0776696 | 10.09.1997 | A3 | EP0776696 | 04.06.1997 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP31445695 | 01.12.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69615316T | 04.07.2002 | T2 | DE69615316D1 | 25.10.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP31445695 | 01.12.1995 |