EP0776696 - Honeycomb-shaped ceramic and method for producing it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.2002 [2002/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kawata Mfg Co., Ltd. 15-15 Awaza 1-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | For all designated states OSAKA PREFECTURE 1-22 Otemae 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/23] | For all designated states Kawata Mfg Co., Ltd. 15-15 Awaza 1-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | ||
For all designated states OSAKA PREFECTURE 1-22 Otemae 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawasaki, Jiro, Sanda Fac., Kawata Mgf. Co., Ltd. 501-17, Miyanomae, Fukushima Sanda-shi, Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Kaji, Mitsunari Sanda Fac., Kawata Mgf. Co., Ltd. 501-17, Miyanomae, Fukushima Sanda-shi, Hyogo / JP | 03 /
Miyamoto, Hiroki 23-17, Nishichiyogaoka 1-chome Nara-shi, Nara / JP | [1997/23] | Representative(s) | West, Alan Harry, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/23] | West, Alan Harry, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96308652.5 | 29.11.1996 | [1997/23] | Priority number, date | JP19950314456 | 01.12.1995 Original published format: JP 31445695 | [1997/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0776696 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0776696 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | [1997/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0776696 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/28, B01J20/18, C04B35/80 | [1997/36] | CPC: |
B01J20/183 (EP);
B01J20/28045 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/23] | B01J20/28, B01J20/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/23] | Title | German: | Keramischer Wabenkörper und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1997/23] | English: | Honeycomb-shaped ceramic and method for producing it | [1997/23] | French: | Céramique en nid d'abeilles et sa méthode de production | [1997/23] | Examination procedure | 04.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/18] | 16.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPH05146676 ; | [Y]EP0167324 (MOBIL OIL) [Y] 1 * page 7; example 1 *; | [A]DE3738916 (IBS ENGIN.+CONSULT. INGENIEURBÜRO) [A] 1,2 * page 8; claims 7,8 *; | [A]EP0519073 (TAKEDA) [A] 1 * page 4, line 32 - page 5, line 54 *; | [A]JPH06138170 ; | [A]JPH0523528 ; | [A]JPS61171539 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 17, no. 533, Database accession no. (C - 1114), & JP05146676 A 19930615 (KAWATA) [Y] 1 * abstract * [A] 3,4 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 39, Database accession no. 94-312959, XP002035081 & JPH06138170 A 00000000 (MATSUDA) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 10, Database accession no. 93-079570, XP002035082 & JPH0523528 A 00000000 (KAWATA) [A] 1,3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 377, Database accession no. (C - 392), & JP61171539 A 00000000 (BABCOCK HITACHI) [A] 1 * abstract * |