Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0811007
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
27.06.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
29.09.2006 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.11.2006 [2006/44] |
07.10.2005 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 23.11.2005 [2005/47] |
28.09.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
28.09.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
29.04.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.03.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.03.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.03.2004 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
06.03.2004 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
03.03.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.03.2004 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
09.12.2003 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
28.06.2003 |
First examination report |
|
24.06.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
26.02.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.03.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.02.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.03.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.03.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.03.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
24.10.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.12.1997 [1997/50] |
24.10.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.12.1997 [1997/50] |
26.07.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.07.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.10.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.04.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|