Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4117386B | Global Dossier | 16.07.2008 | B2 | JPH11500438 | 12.01.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9600635 | 14.02.1996 | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU710172B | Global Dossier | 16.09.1999 | B2 | AU4665596 | 11.09.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9600635 | 14.02.1996 | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0811007 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2005 | B1 | EP0811007 | 10.12.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9600635 | 14.02.1996 | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE310739T | 15.12.2005 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP9600635 | 14.02.1996 | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BG63503B | 29.03.2002 | B1 | BG101825 | 30.04.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9600635 | 14.02.1996 | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9607333 | 25.11.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9600635 | 14.02.1996 | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2210693 | 22.04.2008 | C | CA2210693 | 29.08.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9600635 | 14.02.1996 | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59611304D1 | 29.12.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP9600635 | 14.02.1996 | DE59611304 | 14.02.1996 | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA001228 | 25.12.2000 | B1 | EA199700194 | 26.02.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9600635 | 14.02.1996 | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EE03486 | 15.08.2001 | B1 | EE9700190 | 16.02.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9600635 | 14.02.1996 | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI120688B | 29.01.2010 | B | FI973471 | 22.08.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9600635 | 14.02.1996 | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU225015 | 29.05.2006 | B1 | HUP9800725 | 28.06.2000 | A3 | HUP9800725 | 28.07.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP9600635 | 14.02.1996 | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100393500B | 17.10.2003 | B1 | KR19987002466 | 15.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9600635 | 14.02.1996 | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | LV11895 | 20.03.1998 | B | LV11895 | 20.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9600635 | 14.02.1996 | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX200572 | 17.01.2001 | B | MX9706123 | 29.11.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9600635 | 14.02.1996 | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NL350032I | 01.10.2007 | I2 | NL350032I | 02.07.2007 | I1 | Priority number | Date | EP9600635 | 14.02.1996 | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO308849B | 06.11.2000 | B1 | NO973861L | 22.10.1997 | L | NO973861D0 | 22.08.1997 | D0 | Priority number | Date | EP9600635 | 14.02.1996 | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ301272 | 25.02.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9600635 | 14.02.1996 | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL183233B | 28.06.2002 | B1 | PL322277 | 19.01.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9600635 | 14.02.1996 | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SK285225B | 07.09.2006 | B6 | SK104297 | 08.07.1998 | A3 | Priority number | Date | EP9600635 | 14.02.1996 | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW304946B | 11.05.1997 | B | Priority number | Date | EP9600635 | 14.02.1996 | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA61052 | 17.11.2003 | C2 | Priority number | Date | EP9600635 | 14.02.1996 | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5846907 | 08.12.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9600635 | 14.02.1996 | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9626206 | Global Dossier | 29.08.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR001021 | 27.08.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1071757C | 26.09.2001 | C | CN1175951 | 11.03.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ293254 | 17.03.2004 | B6 | CZ247397 | 13.05.1998 | A3 | Priority number | Date | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0811007T | 06.02.2006 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2255073T | 16.06.2006 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GEP20002093 | 10.05.2000 | B | Priority number | Date | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR19980702466 | 15.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT4307 | 25.03.1998 | B | LT97145 | 26.01.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR199700844T | 21.01.1998 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA961444 | 25.08.1997 | B | Priority number | Date | DE19506572 | 24.02.1995 |