EP0811007 - PYRAZOL-4-YL-BENZOYL DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS HERBICIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [1997/50] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VON DEYN, Wolfgang Lüderitzstrasse 4 D-67434 Neustadt / DE | 02 /
HILL, Regina, Luise Ziegelofenweg 40 D-67346 Speyer / DE | 03 /
KARDORFF, Uwe D 3.4 D-68159 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
ENGEL, Stefan Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 13 D-65510 Idstein / DE | 05 /
OTTEN, Martina Gunterstrasse 28 D-67069 Ludwigshafen / DE | 06 /
VOSSEN, Marcus Wilhelm-Wundt-Strasse 7 D-68199 Mannheim / DE | 07 /
PLATH, Peter Hans-Balcke-Strasse 13 D-67227 Frankenthal / DE | 08 /
RANG, Harald Ziegeleistrasse 7 D-67122 Altrip / DE | 09 /
HARREUS, Albrecht Beuthener Strasse 10 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | 10 /
KÖNIG, Hartmann Blumenstrasse 16 D-69115 Heidelberg / DE | 11 /
WALTER, Helmut Grünstadter Strasse 82 D-67283 Obrigheim / DE | 12 /
WESTPHALEN, Karl-Otto Mausbergweg 58 D-67346 Speyer / DE | 13 /
MISSLITZ, Ulf Am Herzel 40 D-67433 Neustadt / DE | [1997/50] | Application number, filing date | 96902274.8 | 14.02.1996 | [1997/50] | WO1996EP00635 | Priority number, date | DE1995106572 | 24.02.1995 Original published format: DE 19506572 | [1997/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9626206 | Date: | 29.08.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0811007 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0811007 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07D409/10, C07D413/10, C07D417/10, A01N43/56 | [1997/50] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/50] | Title | German: | PYRAZOL-4-YL-BENZOYLDERIVATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS HERBIZIDE | [1997/50] | English: | PYRAZOL-4-YL-BENZOYL DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS HERBICIDES | [1997/50] | French: | DERIVES DE PYRAZOL-4-YL-BENZOYLE ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME HERBICIDES | [1997/50] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/50] | 26.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/44] | Request for further processing for: | 23.02.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 23.02.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.03.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]EP0282944 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [DY] 1-8 * page 293 - page 295; claim 1 * * page 47, line 31 *; | [A]EP0410552 (SCHERING AG [DE]) [A] 1-8* page 9 - page 10; examples 1.01-1.12 *; | [Y] - F.D. KING, Medicinal Chemistry: Principles and Practice, CAMBRIDGE, GB, THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, (1994), XP002000848 [Y] 1-8 * siehe Seite 208; Tabelle 2, 3. Eintrag: "CARBOXYLIC ESTER GROUP" * |