EP0833993 - A COUPLING BETWEEN TWO STRUCTURAL ELEMENTS AND SPATIAL STRUCTURE WITH SUCH COUPLINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bertels, Augustinus Wilhelmus Maria Utrechtseweg 437 6865 CL Doorwerth / NL | [1998/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/15] | Representative(s) | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2005/10] | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1998/15] | Schumann, Bernard Herman Johan Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 96902490.0 | 11.01.1996 | [1998/15] | WO1996NL00023 | Priority number, date | NL19950000072 | 13.01.1995 Original published format: NL 9500072 | [1998/15] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9621781 | Date: | 18.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0833993 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E04C5/04, E04C5/16 | [1998/15] | CPC: |
E04C5/16 (EP,US);
E01F8/0023 (EP,US);
E04C5/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/15] | Title | German: | KUPPLUNG ZWISCHEN KONSTRUKTIONSELEMENTEN UND RÄUMLICHE KONSTRUKTION MIT SOLCHER KUPPLUNG | [1998/15] | English: | A COUPLING BETWEEN TWO STRUCTURAL ELEMENTS AND SPATIAL STRUCTURE WITH SUCH COUPLINGS | [1998/15] | French: | ACCOUPLEMENT ENTRE DEUX ELEMENTS DE STRUCTURE, ET STRUCTURE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE COMPORTANT DES ACCOUPLEMENTS DE CE TYPE | [1998/15] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.1996 | Translation filed | 13.08.1997 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.08.1997 | Examination requested [1998/15] | 16.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/06] | 10.01.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.01.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/06] | Appeal following examination | 08.08.2003 | Appeal received No. T0032/04 | 24.10.2003 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.10.2005 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 27.10.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.11.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.02.1998 | 31.01.2000 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 31.01.2002 | 07   M06   Not yet paid | 31.01.2003 | 08   M06   Not yet paid | 31.01.2004 | 09   M06   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR1341305 (BAUSTAHLGEWEBE GMBH) [X] 1-5 * page 1, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 1, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 2, column 1, paragraph 8 - page 2, column 2, paragraph 2 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP0136283 (BEST BAUEISEN & STAHL [AT]) [X] 1-5 * page 7, line 6 - page 7, line 15 * * page 7, line 20 - page 8, line 10 * * page 13, line 37 - page 14, line 24 * * figures 6-9,37-43,52 *; | [A]DE3513235 (BUCHER FRANZ) [A] 1,2,4,5 * page 7, line 24 - page 8, line 16 * * figures 1-5 * |