EP0815517 - IMAGE DATA TRANSFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2000 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.04.2000 [2000/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Dialog Corporation plc The Communications Building, 48 Leicester Square London WC2H 7DB / GB | [1998/15] |
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states M.A.I.D. plc The Communications Building, 48 Leicester Square London WC2H 7DB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOWNS, Iain, Macauley 34 Hornsey Lane Gardens Highgate, London N6 5PB / GB | 02 /
JAIN, Neetu 119 Park Road Hendon, London NW4 3PA / GB | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Atkinson, Ralph, et al Atkinson & Company Intellectual Property Limited 7 Moorgate Road Rotherham South Yorkshire S60 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/21] | Atkinson, Ralph, et al Atkinson & Co., PO Box 1205 Sheffield S9 3UR / GB | ||
Former [1998/02] | Atkinson, Ralph, et al Atkinson & Co., The Technology Park, 60 Shirland Lane Sheffield S9 3SP / GB | Application number, filing date | 96907582.9 | 19.03.1996 | [1998/02] | WO1996GB00656 | Priority number, date | GB19950005741 | 21.03.1995 Original published format: GB 9505741 | [1998/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9629658 | Date: | 26.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0815517 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0815517 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/22, G06F17/27, G06F17/21 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
G06F40/149 (EP,US);
G06F40/103 (EP,US);
G06F40/12 (EP,US);
G06F40/123 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99942 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IE, IT, LI, NL [1998/02] | Title | German: | TRANSFER VON BILDDATEN | [1998/02] | English: | IMAGE DATA TRANSFER | [1998/02] | French: | TRANSFERT DE DONNEES GRAPHIQUES | [1998/02] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.09.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 29.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0215133 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,6,11,16 * page 2, line 1 - page 4, line 1 *; | [A]EP0574224 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1,6,11,16 * column 2, line 4 - line 52 * * column 6, line 14 - line 48 * * column 12, line 50 - column 13, line 34 *; | [A]US5319748 (MOTOYAMA TETSURO [US]) [A] 1,6,11,16 * column 1, line 32 - column 3, line 68 * * column 5, line 1 - column 6, line 65; figures 1-6 *; | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Generating Compact Postscript Files for Both Display and Printing.", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK, US, (199209), vol. 35, no. 4B, pages 110 - 111, XP000318872 [A] 4,14 * the whole document * |