25.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
26.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] |
11.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] |
17.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] |
19.04.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] |
10.11.2000 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] |
27.10.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2000 [2000/50] |
21.07.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.09.2000 [2000/36] |
12.05.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.06.2000 [2000/26] |
28.04.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.06.2000 [2000/24] |
06.08.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.09.1999 [1999/38] |
13.07.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.03.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
26.03.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.03.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.02.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
07.08.1998 |
First examination report |
|
31.07.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
04.03.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.01.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.02.1998 [1998/09] |
09.01.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.02.1998 [1998/09] |
02.01.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.11.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.11.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.01.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.11.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.05.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|