EP0824720 - ACID BLEACHABLE DYE CONTAINING LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/09] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOGEL, Dennis, E. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
BALCHUNIS, Robert, J. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
GARDNER, James, P. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
TIERS, George. V., D. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
VOGEL, Kim, M. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1998/09] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/09] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96908868.1 | 21.03.1996 | [1998/09] | WO1996US03759 | Priority number, date | US19950433887 | 02.05.1995 Original published format: US 433887 | [1998/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9635143 | Date: | 07.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0824720 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0824720 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/105 | [1998/09] | CPC: |
G03F7/105 (EP,US);
Y10S430/115 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1998/09] | Title | German: | SÄUREBLEICHBARER FARBSTOFF ENTHALTEND LITHOGRAPHISCHE DRUCKPLATTENZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [1998/09] | English: | ACID BLEACHABLE DYE CONTAINING LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE COMPOSITION | [1998/09] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POUR PLAQUES D'IMPRESSION LITHOGRAPHIQUE CONTENANT UN COLORANT DECOLORABLE PAR L'ACIDE | [1998/09] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/09] | 05.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.09.1999 | BE | 22.09.1999 | CH | 22.09.1999 | ES | 22.09.1999 | LI | 22.09.1999 | NL | 22.09.1999 | SE | 22.09.1999 | DK | 22.12.1999 | PT | 22.12.1999 | [2003/46] |
Former [2003/09] | AT | 22.09.1999 | |
BE | 22.09.1999 | ||
CH | 22.09.1999 | ||
ES | 22.09.1999 | ||
LI | 22.09.1999 | ||
NL | 22.09.1999 | ||
SE | 22.09.1999 | ||
PT | 22.12.1999 | ||
Former [2002/27] | AT | 22.09.1999 | |
BE | 22.09.1999 | ||
CH | 22.09.1999 | ||
ES | 22.09.1999 | ||
LI | 22.09.1999 | ||
SE | 22.09.1999 | ||
PT | 22.12.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 22.09.1999 | |
BE | 22.09.1999 | ||
CH | 22.09.1999 | ||
LI | 22.09.1999 | ||
SE | 22.09.1999 | ||
PT | 22.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 22.09.1999 | |
BE | 22.09.1999 | ||
CH | 22.09.1999 | ||
LI | 22.09.1999 | ||
PT | 22.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 22.09.1999 | |
BE | 22.09.1999 | ||
PT | 22.12.1999 | ||
CH | 27.12.1999 | ||
LI | 27.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/26] | AT | 22.09.1999 | |
BE | 22.09.1999 | ||
PT | 22.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 22.09.1999 | |
BE | 22.09.1999 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US5102771 (VOGEL DENNIS E [US], et al) [DA] 1-29* the whole document * |