EP0828580 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR THE WAVE OR VAPOUR-PHASE SOLDERING OF ELECTRONIC UNITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.2002 [2002/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHEEL, Wolfgang Lichtenberger Strasse 9 D-10178 Berlin / DE | 02 /
RING, Karl Wilfinger Strasse 29 D-82275 Emmering / DE | 03 /
HAFNER, Willi Rainfeldweg 18 CH-4710 Balsthal / CH | 04 /
LEICHT, Helmut Messerschmittweg 61 D-86343 Königsbrunn / DE | [1998/12] | Application number, filing date | 96915960.7 | 24.05.1996 | [1998/12] | WO1996DE00968 | Priority number, date | DE19951019188 | 24.05.1995 Original published format: DE 19519188 | [1998/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9637330 | Date: | 28.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0828580 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0828580 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B23K1/015, B23K1/08 | [1998/12] | CPC: |
B23K1/015 (EP,US);
H05K3/3494 (EP,US);
B23K2101/40 (EP,US);
H05K2203/088 (EP,US);
H05K3/3415 (EP,US);
H05K3/3468 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1998/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM WELLEN- UND/ODER DAMPFPHASENLÖTEN ELEKTRONISCHER BAUGRUPPEN | [1998/12] | English: | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR THE WAVE OR VAPOUR-PHASE SOLDERING OF ELECTRONIC UNITS | [1998/12] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE BRASER A LA VAGUE ET/OU EN PHASE VAPEUR DES COMPOSANTS ELECTRONIQUES | [1998/12] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/12] | 18.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.07.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4194297 (PFAHL ROBERT C JR [US]) [X] 1-4,18,23,25,28,33 * column 3, paragraph 2; figure 1 *; | [A]US5146694 (MISHINA HARUO [JP], et al) [A] 1,10,11,14,18,19,22-24,39 * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 7; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0211563 (NIPPON DENNETSU KEIKI KK [JP]) [A] 1,5,6,9,14-18,23,24,31,35,39 * page 2, line 31 - page 4, line 28; figure 1 *; | [A]DE4024181 (SIEMENS NIXDORF); | [A]EP0239381 (DYNAPERT HTC CORP [US]); | [A]FR2537912 (ANNEMASSE ULTRASONS [FR]); | [A]FR2556110 (MICROTECH [FR]) |