EP0832444 - OPTICAL CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2006 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Draka Comteq Finland Oy Kimmeltie 1 02110 Espoo / FI | [2005/42] |
Former [1998/14] | For all designated states NK Cables Oy Kimmeltie 1 02110 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUVANTO, Markku Päiväkummuntie 12 D FIN-02210 Espoo / FI | 02 /
TUUNANEN, Vesa Jäkäläntie 17 B FIN-00940 Helsinki / FI | [1998/14] | Representative(s) | Peltonen, Antti Sakari, et al Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1998/14] | Peltonen, Antti Sakari, et al Oy Kolster Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 96917520.7 | 11.06.1996 | [1998/14] | WO1996FI00345 | Priority number, date | FI19950002878 | 12.06.1995 Original published format: FI 952878 | [1998/14] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9642028 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/56] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0832444 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0832444 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44 | [1998/14] | CPC: |
G02B6/4429 (EP,US);
G02B6/441 (EP,US);
G02B6/4484 (EP,US);
G02B6/44384 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/14] | Title | German: | OPTISCHES KABEL | [1998/14] | English: | OPTICAL CABLE | [1998/14] | French: | CABLE OPTIQUE | [1998/14] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.1996 | Translation filed | 28.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 28.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/14] | 15.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 02.02.2006 | PT | 03.04.2006 | LU | 11.06.2006 | IE | 12.06.2006 | MC | 30.06.2006 | [2008/36] |
Former [2007/29] | GR | 02.02.2006 | |
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
IE | 12.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | GR | 02.02.2006 | |
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | GR | 02.02.2006 | |
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | GR | 02.02.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0136913 (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP [US]); | [A]US4875757 (GREVELING JOHANNES [CA]) | Examination | EP0022036 |