EP0832158 - GELS MADE FROM TRIBLOCK COPOLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2000 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAYCHEM LIMITED Faraday Road Dorcan, Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB | [1998/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAULUS, Hendrik Groenstraat 69 B-3020 Veltem Beisem / BE | 02 /
OVERBERGH, Noel Beatrijslaan 75 B-3110 Rotselaar / BE | 03 /
HUDSON, John 130 Kings Hill Road Swindon Wiltshire SN1 4LW / GB | 04 /
HAMMOND, Philip, James 3 Noredown Way Wootton Bassett Wiltshire SN4 8BJ / GB | 05 /
Yu, Jianming Avenue Charles Woeste, 66 1090 Brussels / BE | 06 /
PERKINS, Anthony 17 Noredown Way Wootton Bassett Wiltshire SN4 8BJ / GB | [1998/14] | Representative(s) | Jay, Anthony William, et al Tyco Electronics UK Limited European Patent Department Faraday Road Dorcan Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/14] | Jay, Anthony William, et al Raychem Limited Intellectual Property Law Department Faraday Road Dorcan Swindon Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 96917577.7 | 10.06.1996 | [1998/14] | WO1996GB01381 | Priority number, date | GB19950012125 | 15.06.1995 Original published format: GB 9512125 | GB19960008748 | 26.04.1996 Original published format: GB 9608748 | [1998/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9700292 | Date: | 03.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0832158 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0832158 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08L53/00, C08K5/00 | [1998/14] | CPC: |
C08L53/00 (EP,US);
C08F220/1811 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1998/14] | Title | German: | GELE HERGESTELLT AUS TRIBLOCKKOPOLYMEREN | [1999/47] | English: | GELS MADE FROM TRIBLOCK COPOLYMERS | [1998/14] | French: | GELS PRODUITS A PARTIR DE COPOLYMERES TRIBLOCS | [1998/14] |
Former [1998/14] | GELLE HERGESTELLT AUS TRIBLOCKKOPOLYMEREN | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/14] | 16.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.12.1999 | CH | 01.12.1999 | ES | 01.12.1999 | IT | 01.12.1999 | LI | 01.12.1999 | NL | 01.12.1999 | SE | 01.12.1999 | DK | 01.03.2000 | [2008/06] |
Former [2003/46] | AT | 01.12.1999 | |
CH | 01.12.1999 | ||
ES | 01.12.1999 | ||
LI | 01.12.1999 | ||
NL | 01.12.1999 | ||
SE | 01.12.1999 | ||
DK | 01.03.2000 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 01.12.1999 | |
CH | 01.12.1999 | ||
ES | 01.12.1999 | ||
LI | 01.12.1999 | ||
NL | 01.12.1999 | ||
SE | 01.12.1999 | ||
Former [2002/27] | AT | 01.12.1999 | |
CH | 01.12.1999 | ||
ES | 01.12.1999 | ||
LI | 01.12.1999 | ||
SE | 01.12.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 01.12.1999 | |
CH | 01.12.1999 | ||
LI | 01.12.1999 | ||
SE | 01.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 01.12.1999 | |
CH | 01.12.1999 | ||
LI | 01.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/51] | AT | 01.12.1999 | |
CH | 07.03.2000 | ||
LI | 07.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/50] | CH | 07.03.2000 | |
LI | 07.03.2000 | Cited in | International search | [DX]EP0431706 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [DX] 1-19 * see illustrative embodiments IV, V, VI;;; claim 1 *; | [A]US5166274 (MCGRATH JAMES E [US], et al) [A] 1 * example 6; claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0543632 (GRACE W R & CO [US])[A] 1 |