EP0838107 - VARIABLE RATE CIRCUIT-SWITCHED TRANSMISSION SERVICES IN CELLULAR RADIO SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states Nokia Networks Oy Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | |||
Former [1998/18] | For all designated states NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONKASALO, Zhichun 2800 L.Don Dodson 1173 Bedford, Texas 76021 / US | 02 /
MALKAMÄKI, Esa Louhentie 20 C 19 FIN-02130 Espoo / FI | 03 /
HONKASALO, Harri Visakoivunkuja 12 E 32 FIN-02130 Espoo / FI | [2007/32] |
Former [1998/45] | 01 /
HONKASALO, Zhichun 2800 L.Don Dodson # 1173 Bedford, Texas 76021 / US | ||
02 /
MALKAMÄKI, Esa Louhentie 20 C 19 FIN-02130 Espoo / FI | |||
03 /
HONKASALO, Harri Visakoivunkuja 12 E 32 FIN-02130 Espoo / FI | |||
Former [1998/18] | 01 /
HONKASALO, Zhichun Haravakuja 12 FIN-01660 Vantaa / FI | ||
02 /
MALKAMÄKI, Esa Louhentie 20 C 19 FIN-02130 Espoo / FI | |||
03 /
HONKASALO, Harri Haravakuja 12 FIN-01660 Vantaa / FI | Representative(s) | Äkräs, Tapio Juhani, et al Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | Äkräs, Tapio Juhani, et al Kolster Oy Ab,P.O. Box 148, Iso Roobertinkatu 23 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 96922914.5 | 11.07.1996 | [1998/18] | WO1996FI00409 | Priority number, date | FI19950003414 | 12.07.1995 Original published format: FI 953414 | [1998/18] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9703403 | Date: | 30.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0838107 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 30.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26 | [1998/18] | CPC: |
H04W52/267 (EP,US);
H04L1/0009 (EP,US);
H04L1/0025 (EP,US);
H04L1/0032 (EP,US);
H04L1/0046 (EP,US);
H04L1/0071 (EP,US);
H04L1/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/18] | Title | German: | LEITUNGSVERMITTELTE ÜBERTRAGUNGSDIENSTE MIT VARIABLER RATE IN ZELLULAREN FUNKSYSTEMEN | [1998/18] | English: | VARIABLE RATE CIRCUIT-SWITCHED TRANSMISSION SERVICES IN CELLULAR RADIO SYSTEMS | [1998/18] | French: | SERVICE DE TRANSMISSION A DEBIT VARIABLE DANS LES LIAISONS COMMUTEES, POUR UN RESEAU RADIO CELLULAIRE | [1998/18] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.1997 | Translation filed | 05.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 05.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/18] | 18.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/02] | 11.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0548939 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [A]WO9418756 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [PX]EP0709973 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) |