Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0885164
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
09.05.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 25.06.2003 [2003/26] |
18.04.2003 |
Change - applicant |
published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] |
05.07.2002 |
Change - applicant |
published on 21.08.2002 [2002/34] |
17.05.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] |
30.04.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.01.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
09.01.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.09.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.09.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
30.01.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
13.10.2000 |
First examination report |
|
12.10.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.09.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.09.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.12.1998 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 20.01.1999 [1999/03] |
06.11.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.12.1998 [1998/52] |
06.11.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.12.1998 [1998/52] |
05.11.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.09.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.09.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.04.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.03.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.02.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.05.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.04.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|