EP0885164 - LEVER ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.06.2003 [2003/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L & P Property Management Company 4095 Firestone Boulevard South Gate, CA 90280 / US | [2003/23] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states SCHUKRA USA, INC. 1 Leggett Road Carthage, Missouri 61836 / US | ||
Former [1998/52] | For all designated states LIGON BROTHERS MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3776 Van Dyke Almont, MI 48003 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIGON, James, T., Sr. 800 S. Main Street Almont, MI 48003 / US | 02 /
PORTER, Stephen, P. 2070 S. Almont Avenue Lot 130 Imlay City, MI 48444 / US | 03 /
PATRIUS, Andrew, L., Jr. 822 Force Attica, MI 48412 / US | [1998/52] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/52] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96926238.5 | 01.08.1996 | [1998/52] | WO1996US12653 | Priority number, date | US19950515186 | 11.08.1995 Original published format: US 515186 | [1998/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9707046 | Date: | 27.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0885164 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0885164 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.02.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65H75/30, F16D67/02, F16C1/22 | [1998/52] | CPC: |
F16C1/22 (EP,US);
F16C1/18 (EP,US);
F16D67/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1998/52] | Title | German: | BESTÄTIGUNGSHEBEL | [1998/52] | English: | LEVER ACTUATOR | [1998/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ACTIONNEMENT DE LEVIER | [1998/52] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.1998 | Search fee paid | 10.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/52] | 16.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5109963 (HUSTED DAVID M [US], et al) [X] 1 * column W * | International search | [X]US3759358 (QUENNEVILLE R); | [X]US3726370 (HUBBARD L); | [A]US823971 (REMONDY LEON EMILE [FR]); | [A]US3796292 (HARRISON R); | [A]US3876184 (EUDY CHARLES N); | [A]US4614257 (HARADA KUNIYOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US4778138 (YAMADA YUKIFUMI [JP]); | [A]US4786110 (MAHLING HORST [DE], et al); | [A]US4817771 (ITEN PETER [CH]) |