Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0854861
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
17.04.2015 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
27.06.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
31.05.2002 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.07.2002 [2002/29] |
15.03.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.05.2002 [2002/18] |
08.06.2001 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.07.2001 [2001/30] |
23.03.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.01.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
18.01.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.11.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
26.09.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.02.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.01.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
06.10.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.09.1999 |
First examination report |
|
10.09.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
01.10.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.06.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.07.1998 [1998/31] |
12.06.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.07.1998 [1998/31] |
20.05.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.03.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.06.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.11.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|