EP0854861 - OXYAMINO OXIME ETHERS, METHODS AND INTERMEDIATE PRODUCTS FOR THEIR PRODUCTION, AND AGENTS CONTAINING THEM AND USED FOR CONTROLLING HARMFUL FUNGI AND PESTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2002 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [1998/31] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAYER, Herbert D 3.4 D-68159 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
SAUTER, Hubert Neckarpromenade 20 D-68167 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
OBERDORF, Klaus Bienenstrasse 3 D-69117 Heidelberg / DE | 04 /
GRAMMENOS, Wassilios Borsigstrasse 5 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | 05 /
GROTE, Thomas Breslauer Strasse 6 D-67105 Schifferstadt / DE | 06 /
KIRSTGEN, Reinhard Erkenbrechtstrasse 23e D-67434 Neustadt / DE | 07 /
MÜLLER, Bernd Jean-Ganss-Strasse 21 D-67227 Frankenthal / DE | 08 /
MÜLLER, Ruth Von-Wieser-Strasse 1 D-67159 Friedelsheim / DE | 09 /
RÖHL, Franz Sebastian-Kneipp-Strasse 17 D-67105 Schifferstadt / DE | 10 /
AMMERMANN, Eberhard Von-Gagern-Strasse 2 D-64646 Heppenheim / DE | 11 /
HARRIES, Volker Immengärtenweg 29e D-67227 Frankenthal / DE | 12 /
LORENZ, Gisela Erlenweg 13 D-67434 Hambach / DE | 13 /
STRATHMANN, Siegfried Donnersbergstrasse 9 D-67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 14 /
GÖTZ, Norbert Schöfferstrasse 25 D-67547 Worms / DE | [1998/31] | Application number, filing date | 96933424.2 | 30.09.1996 | [1998/31] | WO1996EP04255 | Priority number, date | DE1995137750 | 10.10.1995 Original published format: DE 19537750 | [1998/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9713747 | Date: | 17.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0854861 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0854861 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07C259/12, C07C259/14, A01N37/52, C07C327/56 | [1998/31] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1998/31] | Title | German: | OXYAMINOOXIMETHER, VERFAHREN UND ZWISCHENPRODUKTE ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND SIE ENTHALTENDE MITTEL ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON SCHADPILZEN UND TIERISCHEN SCHÄDLINGEN | [1998/31] | English: | OXYAMINO OXIME ETHERS, METHODS AND INTERMEDIATE PRODUCTS FOR THEIR PRODUCTION, AND AGENTS CONTAINING THEM AND USED FOR CONTROLLING HARMFUL FUNGI AND PESTS | [1998/31] | French: | ETHERS D'OXYAMINO-OXIME, PROCEDES ET PRODUITS INTERMEDIAIRES UTILISES POUR LEUR PRODUCTION ET AGENT LES CONTENANT SERVANT A LUTTER CONTRE LES CHAMPIGNONS PARASITES ET LES PARASITES ANIMAUX | [1998/31] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/31] | 14.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2002/18] | FR | 21.12.2001 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3840596 (RICHTER S, et al) [X] 12* example 12 *; | [AD]WO9316986 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [AD] 1,6-10 * claim - *; | [AD]WO9414322 (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1,6-10 * example -; claim - *; | [A]WO9521153 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,8-10 * claim - * |