EP0959834 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING TRANSDERMAL PATCHES (TTS) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LTS LOHMANN Therapie-Systeme AG Lohmannstrasse 2 56626 Andernach / DE | [2000/28] |
Former [1999/48] | For all designated states LTS LOHMANN Therapie-Systeme GmbH Irlicher Strasse 55 56567 Neuwied / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASMUSSEN, Bodo Im Schlossgarten 10 D-56170 Bendorf / DE | 02 /
HILLE, Thomas Am Moogsberg 2a D-56567 Neuwied / DE | 03 /
SCHUMANN, Klaus Boesnerstrasse 6 D-56567 Neuwied / DE | 04 /
STEINBORN, Peter Im Aubisch 20 D-56567 Neuwied / DE | [1999/48] | Representative(s) | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter, et al Flaccus Müller-Wolff Patentanwälte Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter, Dr., et al Patentanwalt Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | ||
Former [1999/48] | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter, Dr. Patentanwalt Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | Application number, filing date | 96942340.9 | 04.12.1996 | [1999/48] | WO1996EP05410 | Priority number, date | DE1995147691 | 20.12.1995 Original published format: DE 19547691 | [1999/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9722315 | Date: | 26.06.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0959834 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0959834 | Date: | 13.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/02 | [1999/48] | CPC: |
A61K9/7061 (EP,US);
A61F13/02 (KR);
A61K9/7084 (EP,US);
A61F2013/0296 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1967 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/48] | Extension states | SI | 14.05.1998 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG TRANSDERMALER THERAPEUTISCHER PFLASTER (TTS) | [1999/48] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING TRANSDERMAL PATCHES (TTS) | [1999/48] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE SYSTEMES THERAPEUTIQUES TRANSDERMIQUES | [1999/48] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.05.1998 | Examination requested [1999/48] | 17.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2237262 (OSAKA SEALING LABEL PRINT [JP]) [A] 1 * page 11; figure 4 *; | [DA]DE4232279 (LOHMANN THERAPIE SYST LTS [DE]); | [A]WO9523687 (LOHMANN THERAPIE SYST LTS [DE], et al) [A] 1 |