EP0876153 - MEDICAL USE OF PROTEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2001 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.12.2001 [2001/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cortecs (UK) Limited The Old Blue School, Lower Square Isleworth Middlesex TW7 6RL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/46] | For all designated states Cortecs (UK) Limited The Old Blue School, Lower Square Isleworth, Middlesex TW7 6RL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MYNOTT, Tracey, L.-Imp. Col. of Scie., Tec.& Med. nDept. of Biochemistry - Exhibition Road London SW7 2AZ / GB | 02 /
ENGWERDA, C.-London School of Hyg. & Tropic. Med. Dept. of Medical Parasitology - Keppel Street London WC1E 7HT / GB | [1998/46] | Representative(s) | Chapman, Paul William, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/46] | Chapman, Paul William, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96942449.8 | 13.12.1996 | [1998/46] | WO1996GB03089 | Priority number, date | GB19950026691 | 29.12.1995 Original published format: GB 9526691 | [1998/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9724138 | Date: | 10.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0876153 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/43 | [1998/46] | CPC: |
A61K38/4826 (EP);
A61K38/4873 (EP);
A61K39/39 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/46] | Extension states | SI | 28.07.1998 | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHE VERWENDUNG VON PROTEASEN | [1998/46] | English: | MEDICAL USE OF PROTEASES | [1998/46] | French: | UTILISATION MEDICALE DE PROTEASES | [1998/46] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/46] | 29.09.1998 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/51] | 10.07.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2000 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DPY]WO9600082 (CORTECS LTD [GB], et al) [DPY] 1-6 * the whole document * | [XY] - ELENA GABRIELESCU, "An integrative approach to the proteolytic control of the cell-mediated cytotoxicity", ROUM. ARCH. MICROBIOL. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 51, no. 1-2, pages 33 - 51, XP000652932 [X] 1,2,6 * abstract * * page 33 - page 34 * * page 41 * * page 44 - page 45 * [Y] 3-5 | [XY] - "Systematische Enzymtherapie: Grosse Zukunft zu erwarten", THERAPIEWOCHE ÖSTERREICH, (1992), vol. 7, no. 2, pages 65 - 72, XP000652911 [X] 6 * page 66 - page 68 * [Y] 1-5 | [XY] - G.STAUDER, "Pharmacological effects of oral enzyme combinations", CASOPIS LEKARU CESKYCH, (1995), vol. 134, no. 19, pages 620 - 624, XP000652595 [X] 6 * the whole document * [Y] 1-5 | [X] - M.T.ALONSO ET AL., "Leupeptin does not affect the normal signal transduction mechanism in platelets", FEBS LETT., (1989), vol. 244, no. 2, pages 407 - 410, XP000652613 [X] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(89)80573-3 | [X] - DARIO C. ALTIERI, "Proteases and protease receptors in modulation of leukocyte effector functions", J. LEUKOC. BIOL., (1995), vol. 58, no. 2, pages 120 - 127, XP000652620 [X] 1-3 * abstract * * page 122, column L; tables 1,2 * | [X] - DENIS GODIN ET AL., "Mode of action of thrombin in the rat aorta", BR. J. PHARMACOL., (199507), vol. 115, no. 6, pages 903 - 908, XP000652621 [X] 1 * abstract * | [Y] - A.GESCHER, "Modulators of signal transduction as cancer chemotherapeutic agents - novel mechanisms and toxicities", TOXICOLOGY LETTERS, (199512), vol. 82/83, pages 159 - 163, XP000652605 [Y] 1-6 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-4274(95)03475-7 |