Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.07.2001 [2001/28] |
03.05.2001 | Surcharge for renewal fee | |
09.01.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
26.10.2000 | Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973) | |
22.03.2000 | Renewal fee | |
21.01.2000 | Publication of search report | published on 08.03.2000 [2000/10] |
31.03.1999 | Renewal fee | |
01.08.1997 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.09.1997 [1997/38] |