Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0795988 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2000 | A3 | EP0795988 | 17.09.1997 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE19610287 | 15.03.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19610287 | 03.12.1998 | C2 | DE19610287 | 18.09.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19610287 | 15.03.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5999607 | 07.12.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19610287 | 15.03.1996 |