EP0801456 - Electric motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2006 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.10.2006 [2006/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERELECTRIC AG Brünigstrasse 220 CH-6072 Sachseln / CH | [1997/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neumann, Frank Erlenstrasse 85 6020 Emmenbrücke / CH | 02 /
Steffan, Joachim Durnachelistrasse 4 6074 Giswil / CH | 03 /
Mayer, Jürgen Brüggli 3 6072 Sachseln / CH | [1997/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97105861.5 | 09.04.1997 | [1997/42] | Priority number, date | DE1996114218 | 10.04.1996 Original published format: DE 19614218 | [1997/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0801456 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0801456 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | [1999/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0801456 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/15 | [1997/42] | CPC: |
H02K5/15 (EP,US);
H02K5/225 (EP,US);
H02K2211/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/42] | Title | German: | Elektromotor | [1997/42] | English: | Electric motor | [1997/42] | French: | Moteur électrique | [1997/42] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/51] | 11.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1868377U (BUEHLER NACHF G M B H GEB [DE]) [X] 1; | [XY]US3670405 (DOCHTERMAN RICHARD W) [X] 12,13 [Y] 2-5; | [XY]DE2806116 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [X] 1 [Y] 2-5; | [A]GB2160370 (MABUCHI MOTOR CO) |