Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0793226
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
09.02.2001 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 28.03.2001 [2001/13] |
25.02.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.04.2000 [2000/15] |
11.01.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.10.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
21.10.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.09.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.07.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
11.06.1999 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.07.1999 [1999/30] |
11.06.1999 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.07.1999 [1999/30] |
04.06.1999 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.07.1999 [1999/29] |
04.06.1999 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.07.1999 [1999/29] |
12.04.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
14.01.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
17.09.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.09.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.05.1998 |
First examination report |
|
28.05.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
13.02.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.04.1998 [1998/14] |
18.07.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.09.1997 [1997/36] |
31.05.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|