EP0793226 - Disc loading device for a recording/reproducing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.03.2001 [2001/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/36] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Osada, Yasuo c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa, 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [1997/36] | Representative(s) | Körber, Wolfhart, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/36] | Körber, Wolfhart, Dr. rer.nat., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97107637.7 | 28.09.1994 | [1997/36] | Priority number, date | JP19930265524 | 30.09.1993 Original published format: JP 26552493 | JP19930289798 | 27.10.1993 Original published format: JP 28979893 | JP19940238631 | 07.09.1994 Original published format: JP 23863194 | [1997/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0793226 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0793226 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G11B17/30, G11B17/22 | [1999/29] | CPC: |
G11B17/0438 (EP,US);
G11B17/26 (EP,KR,US);
G11B17/225 (EP,US);
G11B17/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/36] | G11B17/22, G11B17/30, // B65G1/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/36] | Title | German: | Plattenladevorrichtung für ein Aufzeichnungs- und/oder Wiedergabegerät | [1997/36] | English: | Disc loading device for a recording/reproducing apparatus | [1997/36] | French: | Dispositif de chargement de disque pour un appareil d'enregistrement et/ou de réproduction | [1997/36] | Examination procedure | 04.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/14] | 03.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94927794.1 / EP0671736 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4797865 (IMAI TOORU [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 5, line 61 - column 7, line 24; figures 1-10 * [A] 2-7; | [A]EP0310427 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 10, line 44 - line 49 *; | [A]EP0539199 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 3 * column 12, line 4 - line 44; figures 5,6 *; | [A]US4879616 (ANDO SHIGERU [JP]) [A] 3 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 39; figures 9-14 * |