Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0829754
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
27.08.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 13.10.2004 [2004/42] |
04.05.2004 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
31.10.2003 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
25.09.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.11.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
19.09.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.06.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.09.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.08.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
31.03.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.11.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
23.09.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.09.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
23.04.1999 |
First examination report |
|
22.04.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
16.10.1998 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 02.12.1998 [1998/49] |
02.10.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.11.1998 [1998/47] |
30.01.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.03.1998 [1998/12] |