EP0829754 - Ultrasonic wave splicing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.2004 [2004/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukumoto, Sachio c/o Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Naohiro c/o Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Nakajima, Syuichi c/o Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Hirayama, Toshio c/o Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1998/12] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 97116045.2 | 16.09.1997 | [1998/12] | Priority number, date | JP19960244925 | 17.09.1996 Original published format: JP 24492596 | JP19970118063 | 08.05.1997 Original published format: JP 11806397 | [1998/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0829754 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/74 | [1998/12] | CPC: |
G03C1/74 (EP,US);
G03C1/025 (EP);
G03C2200/09 (EP)
| C-Set: |
G03C1/74, G03C1/025, G03C2200/09 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/49] |
Former [1998/12] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verbinden von Materialbahnen mittels Ultraschallwellen | [1998/12] | English: | Ultrasonic wave splicing device | [1998/12] | French: | Dispositif pour raccorder des matériaux en bande utilisant des ondes ultrasoniques | [1998/12] | Examination procedure | 18.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/47] | 28.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/42] | 11.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4490199 (DUNNING FREDERICK G [US]) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, line 43 - column 4, line 23 *; | [Y]US4744845 (POSEY JOHN [US]) [Y] 1-10 * column 6, line 31 - line 60; figure 8 *; | [Y]US3867232 (THOMPSON DAVID L, et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, line 48 - column 4, line 8; figures 1,2 *; | [PA]EP0740154 (KODAK LTD [GB], et al) [PA] 11-14 * column 3, line 18 - column 6, line 22; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH04145436 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920908), vol. 16, no. 427, Database accession no. (P - 1416), & JP04145436 A 00000000 (KONICA CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |