EP0848234 - Improved stability Coriolis mass flow meter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2005 [2005/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micro Motion, Inc. 7070 Winchester Circle Boulder, CO 80301 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | For all designated states Micro Motion Inc. 7070 Winchester Circle Boulder, Colorado 80801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cage, Donald Reed 6 Placer Avenue Longmont, Colorado 80501 / US | 02 /
Ruesch, James Richard 6941 Harvest Road Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US | 03 /
Cunningham, Timothy J. 613 Maxwell Street Boulder, Colorado 80302 / US | [1998/25] | Representative(s) | Schubert, Siegmar, et al Patentanwälte Dannenberg Schubert Gudel Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39 60313 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | Schubert, Siegmar, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Weinhold, Dannenberg, Dr. Gudel, Schubert Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39 60313 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 97117987.4 | 08.06.1990 | [1998/25] | Priority number, date | US19890364032 | 09.06.1989 Original published format: US 364032 | [1998/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0848234 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0848234 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | [1998/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/84 | [1998/25] | CPC: |
G01F1/8409 (EP,US);
G01F1/8413 (EP,US);
G01F1/8477 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1998/25] | Title | German: | Stabilitätsverbesserung bei einem Coriolis-Massenflussmesser | [1998/25] | English: | Improved stability Coriolis mass flow meter | [1998/25] | French: | Débitmètre massique de Coriolis à stabilité améliorée | [1998/25] | Examination procedure | 18.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/11] | 18.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/15] | 09.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/15] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP90909995.4 / EP0431132 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 06.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS56125622 ; | [A]US4187721 (SMITH JAMES E [US]) [A] 1,3,4 * the whole document *; | [AD]US4422338 (SMITH JAMES E [US]) [AD] 1,3,4 * the whole document *; | [A]US4823613 (CAGE DONALD R [US], et al) [A] 1-3,7,8 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19811222), vol. 5, no. 202, Database accession no. (P - 95)<874>, & JP56125622 A 19811002 (ESU TEE KENKYUSHO K.K.) [A] 1,3 * abstract * |