EP0913707 - Method for contactless measurement of the distance to an object using the principle of laser triangulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LAP GmbH Laser Applikationen Zeppelinstrasse 23 D-21337 Lüneburg / DE | [1999/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Röckseisen, Armin, Dr. Am Hang 9 21279 Scharnebeck / DE | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1999/18] | Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons Neuer Wall 41 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97119012.9 | 31.10.1997 | [1999/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0913707 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0913707 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/46 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
G01S17/48 (EP,US);
G01S7/4815 (EP,US);
G01S17/87 (EP,US);
G01S7/4811 (EP,US);
G01S7/491 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2000/03] |
Former [1999/18] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur berührungsfreien Messung des Abstands eines Objekts nach dem Prinzip der Laser-Triangulation | [1999/18] | English: | Method for contactless measurement of the distance to an object using the principle of laser triangulation | [1999/18] | French: | Procédé pour mesurer sans contact la distance d'un objet selon le principe de triangulation à laser | [1999/18] | Examination procedure | 03.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/22] | 09.11.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT | 06.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.12.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.12.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.12.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.12.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.12.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.12.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.12.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.12.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.12.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.12.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.12.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0147501 (NIPPON TSUSHIN GIJUTSU KK [JP]) [X] 1,5 * page 13, line 5 - page 18, line 7 * * page 45, line 23 - page 46, line 25 * * page 54, line 16 - line 26 * * figures 5,6,33,46B * [Y] 2-4; | [Y]GB2264601 (3D SCANNERS LTD [GB]) [Y] 2-4 * page 1, paragraph 5 ** page 2, paragraph 1 - page 4, paragraph 5; figure 1 * |