EP0840496 - Method and apparatus for halftoning image data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | [2006/41] |
Former [1998/19] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Curry, Douglas N. 221 Leland Avenue Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | [1998/19] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/19] | Mackett, Margaret Dawn, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 97308670.5 | 30.10.1997 | [1998/19] | Priority number, date | US19960742551 | 01.11.1996 Original published format: US 742551 | [1998/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0840496 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0840496 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | [2003/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0840496 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/405 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
H04N1/4055 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [1998/19] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Halbtonrasterung von Bilddaten | [1998/19] | English: | Method and apparatus for halftoning image data | [1998/19] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour l'obtention de demi-teintes à partir de données d'image | [1998/19] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 30.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0651560 (XEROX CORP [US]) [DA] 1,2,4-6,9,10 * column 13, line 33 - column 14, line 27 *; | [A]US4419690 (HAMMES PHILIPPE [FR]) [A] 1,5 * column 11, line 30 - column 12, line 40 *; | [A]US4821109 (ROE MALCOLM D M [GB]) |