Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0840496
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
24.08.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] |
08.09.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.10.2006 [2006/41] |
05.09.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
05.09.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.04.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.11.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.10.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.05.2005 |
First examination report |
|
25.05.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.11.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.04.2004 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] |
19.03.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.05.2004 [2004/19] |
11.11.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.07.2003 |
Publication of search report |
published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] |
11.11.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.11.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.11.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.11.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.11.1999 |
Change - representative |
published on 22.12.1999 [1999/51] |
19.06.1998 |
Change - extension states |
|
20.03.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.05.1998 [1998/19] |