Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH10145594 | Global Dossier | 29.05.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US74255196 | 01.11.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0840496 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2006 | B1 | EP0840496 | 03.09.2003 | A3 | EP0840496 | 06.05.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US74255196 | 01.11.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69736797T | 18.01.2007 | T2 | DE69736797D1 | 23.11.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US74255196 | 01.11.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5937109 | 10.08.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US74255196 | 01.11.1996 |