EP0844307 - Candida albicans protein caYAE1 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2002 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.04.2002 [2002/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freeman, Kathryn Belinda SmithKline Beecham Pharm., 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US | 02 /
Livi, George Pietro SmithKline Beecham Pharm., 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US | 03 /
Nicholas, Richard Oakly, SmithKline Beecham Pharm. 1250 South Collegeville Road, P O Box 5089 Collegeville, PA 19426-0989 / US | [1998/22] | Representative(s) | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97309348.7 | 20.11.1997 | [1998/22] | Priority number, date | US19960752132 | 21.11.1996 Original published format: US 752132 | [1998/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0844307 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/31, C12N15/81, C07K14/40, C07K16/14, C12N1/19, G01N33/569, A61K39/00, A61K48/00, // (C12N15/31, C12R1:725) | [1998/22] | CPC: |
C07K14/40 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US);
Y10S530/824 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1999/06] |
Former [1998/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Candida albicans Protein caYAE1 | [1998/22] | English: | Candida albicans protein caYAE1 | [1998/22] | French: | Protéine caYAE1 de Candida albicans | [1998/22] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/04] | 21.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.02.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - HUANG ME ET AL, "Analysis of a 62 kb DNA sequence of chromosome X reveals 36 open reading frames and a gene cluster with a counterpart on chromosome XI.", YEAST, JUL 1996, 12 (9) P869-75, ENGLAND, XP002057511 [A] 1,12 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0061(199607)12:9<869::AID-YEA964>3.3.CO;2-T | [A] - CLARK, KAREN L. ET AL, "Constitutive activation of the Saccharomyces cerevisiae mating response pathway by a MAP kinase kinase from Candida albicans", MOL. GEN. GENET. (1995), 249(6), 609-21 CODEN: MGGEAE;ISSN: 0026-8925, XP002057512 [A] 1,12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00418030 |