Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH1024209 | Global Dossier | 27.01.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9603808 | 27.03.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0798464 | Global Dossier | 01.10.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9603808 | 27.03.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2201045 | 27.09.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9603808 | 27.03.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2746667 | 07.05.1998 | B1 | FR2746667 | 03.10.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9603808 | 27.03.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5797980 | 25.08.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9603808 | 27.03.1996 |