Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6290703 | 18.09.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US48195200 | 12.01.2000 | US85441297 | 12.05.1997 | FR9605898 | 13.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4017211B | Global Dossier | 05.12.2007 | B2 | JPH1043202 | 17.02.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9605898 | 13.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU733342B | Global Dossier | 10.05.2001 | B2 | AU2082197 | 20.11.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9605898 | 13.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0807420 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2002 | B1 | EP0807420 | 19.11.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9605898 | 13.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE221342T | 15.08.2002 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR9605898 | 13.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2206152 | 20.07.2004 | C | CA2206152 | 13.11.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9605898 | 13.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69714340T | 03.04.2003 | T2 | DE69714340D1 | 05.09.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR9605898 | 13.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE807420T | 20.05.1999 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR9605898 | 13.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0807420T | 25.11.2002 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR9605898 | 13.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2121569T | 16.12.2002 | T3 | ES2121569T | 01.12.1998 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR9605898 | 13.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2748387 | 30.10.1998 | B1 | FR2748387 | 14.11.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9605898 | 13.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR970073530 | 10.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9605898 | 13.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX9703568 | 28.06.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9605898 | 13.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO972166D0 | 12.05.1997 | D0 | Priority number | Date | FR9605898 | 13.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ314798 | 27.05.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9605898 | 13.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6022350 | 08.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9605898 | 13.05.1996 |