EP0807420 - Bone fixation device, particularly of the sacrum, for spinal osteosynthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.07.2003 [2003/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stryker France Zac Paris Nord II, 13, rue de la Perdrix 93290 Tremblay-en-France / FR | For all designated states Ganem, Franck Hôpital Privé Saint-Martin, 6, avenue du Canada 14000 Caen / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states Stryker France S.A. Zac Paris Nord II, 13, rue de la Perdrix 93290 Tremblay-en-France / FR | ||
For all designated states Ganem, Franck Hôpital Privé Saint-Martin, 6, avenue du Canada 14000 Caen / FR | |||
Former [1997/47] | For all designated states Stryker France S.A. Zac Paris Nord II, 13, rue de la Perdrix 93290 Tremblay-en-France / FR | ||
For all designated states Ganem, Franck Hôpital Privé Saint-Martin, 6, avenue du Canada 14000 Caen / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ganem, Franck 48, rue de la Folie 14000 Caen / FR | [1997/47] | Representative(s) | Le Forestier, Eric Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | Le Forestier, Eric Cabinet Regimbeau, 26, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97401057.1 | 13.05.1997 | [1997/47] | Priority number, date | FR19960005898 | 13.05.1996 Original published format: FR 9605898 | [1997/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0807420 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0807420 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70 | [1997/47] | CPC: |
A61B17/7059 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/7055 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/8042 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/8047 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2017/00858 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, GB, GR, IT, NL, SE [1997/47] | Title | German: | Knochenbefestigungsvorrichtung, insbesondere des Kreuzbeines, für die Osteosynthese der Wirbelsäule | [1997/47] | English: | Bone fixation device, particularly of the sacrum, for spinal osteosynthesis | [1997/47] | French: | Dispositif de fixation osseuse, en particulier au sacrum, en ostéosynthèse du rachis | [1997/47] | Examination procedure | 27.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/26] | 05.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0201024 (WOLTER DIETMAR) [A] 1* abstract *; | [X]EP0625337 (TORNIERS A [FR]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * column 3, line 39 - line 43 *; | [A]EP0654249 (GRAF HENRY [FR]) [A] 9-15 * figures 10,11; claim 1 * * column 5, line 41 - line 46 * * column 7, line 42 - line 49 *; | [A]US5443467 (BIEDERMANN LUTZ [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,5-8 * abstract * * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 2 * |