Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0810137
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
11.10.2002 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] |
19.10.2001 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.12.2001 [2001/49] |
12.09.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.05.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
29.05.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.05.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.03.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
14.06.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.04.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.03.2000 |
First examination report |
|
25.02.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
30.04.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.10.1998 |
Change - representative |
published on 18.11.1998 [1998/47] |
05.06.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.07.1998 [1998/30] |
17.10.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.12.1997 [1997/49] |
10.06.1997 |
Change - extension states |
|