Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH1053132 | Global Dossier | 24.02.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9606589 | 29.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0810137 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2001 | B1 | EP0810137 | 03.12.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9606589 | 29.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE210040T | 15.12.2001 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR9606589 | 29.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9703335 | 27.10.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9606589 | 29.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2207493 | 04.01.2005 | C | CA2207493 | 29.11.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9606589 | 29.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1084687C | 15.05.2002 | C | CN1167709 | 17.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9606589 | 29.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ156197 | 17.12.1997 | A3 | Priority number | Date | FR9606589 | 29.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69708753T | 12.09.2002 | T2 | DE69708753D1 | 17.01.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR9606589 | 29.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0810137T | 02.04.2002 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR9606589 | 29.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2165002T | 01.03.2002 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR9606589 | 29.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2749223 | 31.07.1998 | B1 | FR2749223 | 05.12.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9606589 | 29.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU222780 | 28.10.2003 | B1 | HUP9700961 | 29.04.2002 | A3 | HUP9700961 | 28.07.1999 | A2 | HU9700961D0 | 28.07.1997 | D0 | Priority number | Date | FR9606589 | 29.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100488831B | 13.09.2006 | B1 | KR970074554 | 10.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9606589 | 29.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL320213 | 08.12.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9606589 | 29.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT810137E | 31.05.2002 | E | Priority number | Date | FR9606589 | 29.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5941174 | 24.08.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9606589 | 29.05.1996 |