EP0810137 - Driven axle with independently rotating wheels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEC ALSTHOM TRANSPORT SA 38, Avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | [2001/49] |
Former [1997/49] | For all designated states GEC ALSTHOM TRANSPORT SA 38, Avenue Kleber 75116 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rodet, Alain Parc de la Couronne, Bât A., Route de Montcenis 71200 Le Creusot / FR | [1997/49] | Representative(s) | Gosse, Michel, et al ALSTOM Technologies C.I.P.D. 23/25 Avenue Morane-Saulnier 92360 Meudon La Foret / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/47] | Gosse, Michel, et al ALSTOM FRANCE SA Département de Propriété Industrielle, 38, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1997/49] | Fournier, Michel, et al c/o Alcatel Alsthom Recherche DPI, 30 Avenue Kleber 75016 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97401079.5 | 15.05.1997 | [1997/49] | Priority number, date | FR19960006589 | 29.05.1996 Original published format: FR 9606589 | [1997/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0810137 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0810137 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B61F3/16, B61C9/44 | [1997/49] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/49] | Extension states | RO | 21.05.1997 | Title | German: | Angetriebene Achse mit unabhängig drehenden Rädern | [1997/49] | English: | Driven axle with independently rotating wheels | [1997/49] | French: | Essieu motorisé à roues indépendantes en rotation | [1997/49] | Examination procedure | 26.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/30] | 01.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0043340 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,15 * page 5, line 19 - page 6, line 3; figure 3 *; | [A]GB2102358 (ABERCOM AFRICA LTD [ZA]) [A] 1,15* the whole document * |