EP0818672 - Bourdon tube for protection against excess pressure in pressure gauges [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aldiso, S.L. C. Pare Llaurador, 272 08224 Terrassa / ES | [1998/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Banus Garcia, Fernando C. Para Llaurador, 272 08224 Terrassa / ES | [1998/03] | Representative(s) | Ponti Sales, Adelaida Oficina Ponti C. Consell de Cent, 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Ponti Sales, Adelaida Oficina Ponti C. Consell de Cent 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [1998/03] | Ponti Sales, Adelaida Pg. de Gracia, 33 08007 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 97500121.5 | 09.07.1997 | [1998/03] | Priority number, date | ES19960001911U | 12.07.1996 Original published format: ES 9601911 U | [1998/03] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0818672 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0818672 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01L7/04 | [1998/03] | CPC: |
G01L19/0618 (EP);
G01L7/04 (EP);
G01L7/041 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/39] |
Former [1998/03] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Drucksensor mit Bourdonrohr zum Schutz gegen Überdruck | [1998/03] | English: | Bourdon tube for protection against excess pressure in pressure gauges | [1998/03] | French: | Capteur de pression à tube Bourdon de protection contre des surpressions | [1998/03] | Examination procedure | 25.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/30] | 15.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 02.05.2003 | IT | 02.05.2003 | GB | 02.08.2003 | DE | 05.08.2003 | [2008/07] |
Former [2004/45] | FR | 02.05.2003 | |
GB | 02.08.2003 | ||
DE | 05.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/34] | FR | 02.05.2003 | |
DE | 05.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | DE | 05.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH559907 (PREISS MAX MANOMETER FABRIK) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2321956 (ALEXANDER WIEGAND ARMATUREN U) [A] 1 * the whole document * |