EP0888302 - N- (R)-1- 3-(4-PIPERIDYL)PROPIONYL-3-PIPERIDYLCARBONYL -2(S)-ACETYLAMINO-BETA-ALANINE AS FIBRINOGEN RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/01] | N- (R)-1- 3-(4-PIPERIDYL)PROPIONYL-3-PIPERIDYLCARBONYL]-2(S)-ACETYLAMINO-BETA-ALANINE AS FIBRINOGEN RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST | ||
[2007/46] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2007 | Change - German title | published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 4-7, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8514 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 4-7, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8514 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHKUBO, Mitsuru 5-1-65, Fushimidai, Inagawa-cho Kawabe-gun, Hyogo 666-02 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Fumie 3-4-29, Hishiyanishi Higashiosaka-shi, Osaka 577 / JP | 03 /
YAMANAKA, Toshio 1-4-5, Akagawa, Asahi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 535 / JP | 04 /
KATO, Masayuki 6-16-12, Goryo-oeyamacho, Nishikyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 610-11 / JP | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 97907277.4 | 12.03.1997 | [1999/01] | WO1997JP00769 | Priority number, date | ZA19960002033 | 13.03.1996 Original published format: ZA 9602033 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9733869 | Date: | 18.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0888302 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/42, A61K31/455 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
C07D211/60 (EP,KR);
A61K31/445 (KR);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/01] | Title | German: | N-(R)-1-3-(4-PIPERIDYL)PROPIONYL-3-PIPERIDYLCARBONYL -2(S)-ACETYLAMINO-BETA-ALANIN UND SEINE ANWENDUNG ALS FIBRINOGEN-REZEPTOR-ANTAGONIST | [2007/46] | English: | N- (R)-1- 3-(4-PIPERIDYL)PROPIONYL-3-PIPERIDYLCARBONYL -2(S)-ACETYLAMINO-BETA-ALANINE AS FIBRINOGEN RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST | [2007/46] | French: | N- (R)-1- 3-(4-PIPERIDYL)PROPIONYL-3-PIPERIDYLCARBONYL -2(S)-ACETYLAMINO-BETA-ALANINE UTILISEE COMME ANTAGONISTE DU RECEPTEUR DU FIBRINOGENE | [2007/46] |
Former [1999/01] | N-(R)-1-3-(4-PIPERIDYL)PROPIONYL-3-PIPERIDYLCARBONYL]-2(S)-ACETYLAMINO-BETA-ALANIN UND SEINE ANWENDUNG ALS FIBRINOGEN-REZEPTOR-ANTAGONIST | ||
Former [1999/01] | N- (R)-1- 3-(4-PIPERIDYL)PROPIONYL-3-PIPERIDYLCARBONYL]-2(S)-ACETYLAMINO-BETA-ALANINE AS FIBRINOGEN RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST | ||
Former [1999/01] | N- (R)-1- 3-(4-PIPERIDYL)PROPIONYL-3-PIPERIDYLCARBONYL]-2(S)-ACETYLAMINO-BETA-ALANINE UTILISEE COMME ANTAGONISTE DU RECEPTEUR DU FIBRINOGENE | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.08.1998 | Examination requested [1999/01] | 19.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/02] | 05.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.04.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.04.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO9629309 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [PX] 1-6 * example 146; claims 1,11-15 *; | [X]WO9508536 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * Example 26(6) *;; claims 1,13-17 *; | [DY]EP0445796 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [DY] 1-6 * entire document *; | [DY]EP0512831 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [DY] 1-6 * entire document *; | [Y]WO9525091 (ORTHO PHARMA CORP [US]) [Y] 1-6 * example 8; claim 1 *; | [Y]WO9511228 (SUMITOMO PHARMA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6 * entire document *; | [Y] - W. J. HOEKSTRA ET AL., "Solid-phase parallel synthesis applied to lead optimization: discovery of potent analogues of the GPIIb/IIIa antagonist RWJ-50042", BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (1996), vol. 6, no. 20, pages 2371 - 2376, XP000572765 [Y] 1-6 * compound of formula 1, 17, 18 *;; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00010a002 | [Y] - W. J. HOEKSTRA ET AL., "Design and Evaluation of Nonpeptide Fibrinogen gamma-Chain Based GPIIb/IIIa Antagonists", J. MED. CHEM., (1995), vol. 38, no. 10, pages 1582 - 1592, XP000572765 [Y] 1-6 * compound of formula 25 *;; table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00010a002 |