EP0890255 - FRAUD MONITORING IN A TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Azure Solutions Limited Finsbury Circus House 12-15 Finsbury Circus London EC2M 7BT / GB | [2005/14] |
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states Azure Solutions Limited Finsbury Square House 12-15 Finsbury House London EC2M 7BT / GB | ||
Former [2003/34] | For all designated states Azure Solutions Limited Sirius Building B54 Adastral Park Martlesham Heath Ipswich, Suffolk IP5 3RE / GB | ||
Former [1999/02] | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUSUIOC, Nicolae, Marius 28 Henslow Road Ipswich Suffolk IP4 5EG / GB | [1999/02] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/34] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner, Shipley & Co, 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 97914436.7 | 25.03.1997 | [1999/02] | WO1997GB00836 | Priority number, date | EP19960302240 | 29.03.1996 Original published format: EP 96302240 | [1999/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9737486 | Date: | 09.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0890255 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0890255 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04M15/00, H04M3/38, H04Q3/00 | [1999/02] | CPC: |
H04M15/47 (EP,US);
H04M15/00 (EP,US);
H04M3/38 (EP,US);
H04Q3/0016 (EP,US);
H04M2203/6027 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0148 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13054 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1313 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13139 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/02] | Title | German: | BETRUGSÜBERWACHUNG IN EINEM FERNMELDENETZ | [1999/02] | English: | FRAUD MONITORING IN A TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK | [1999/02] | French: | SURVEILLANCE DES FRAUDES DANS UN RESEAU DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS | [1999/02] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.09.1998 | Examination requested [1999/02] | 15.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 26.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 04.08.2004 | CH | 04.08.2004 | LI | 04.08.2004 | NL | 04.08.2004 | SE | 04.11.2004 | ES | 15.11.2004 | PT | 04.01.2005 | [2013/51] |
Former [2008/07] | BE | 04.08.2004 | |
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
NL | 04.08.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
ES | 15.11.2004 | ||
PT | 04.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/24] | BE | 04.08.2004 | |
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
NL | 04.08.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
ES | 15.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | BE | 04.08.2004 | |
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
ES | 15.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | CH | 04.08.2004 | |
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
ES | 15.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | CH | 04.08.2004 | |
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 04.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0653868 (AT & T CORP [US]) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0583135 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0618713 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 2, line 16 - line 18 *; | [A]EP0661863 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9411959 (CORAL SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-17 * abstract *; | [PX]US5602906 (PHELPS JAMES W [US]) [PX] 1,17 * the whole document * |