EP0890166 - DIGITAL AUDIO CREATION METHOD AND SOUND SYNTHESISING AND/OR RECORDING DEVICES USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JULLIAN, Michel Mas Chauvain, Route de Villeneuve Maurin 34970 Lattes / FR | For all designated states Friedel, Pierre-Antoine Mas Chauvain, Route de Villeneuve Maurin 34970 Lattes / FR | [2001/21] |
Former [1999/02] | For all designated states JULLIAN, Michel 93, Chemin du Lavoir 34820 Assas / FR | ||
For all designated states Friedel, Pierre-Antoine 93, Chemin du Lavoir 34820 Assas / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/02] | Application number, filing date | 97916489.4 | 25.03.1997 | [1999/02] | WO1997FR00520 | Priority number, date | FR19960004145 | 27.03.1996 Original published format: FR 9604145 | [1999/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9736285 | Date: | 02.10.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0890166 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0890166 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G10K15/02 | [1999/02] | CPC: |
G10K15/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1999/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUDIONUMERISCHER SCHÖPFUNG UND DIESES VERFAHREN BENÜTZENDE ANLAGEN ZUR SYNTHETISIERUNG UND/ODER TONAUFNAHME | [1999/02] | English: | DIGITAL AUDIO CREATION METHOD AND SOUND SYNTHESISING AND/OR RECORDING DEVICES USING SAME | [1999/02] | French: | PROCEDE DE CREATION AUDIONUMERIQUE ET DISPOSITIFS DE SYNTHESE ET/OU D'ENREGISTREMENT DE SON METTANT EN OEUVRE CE PROCEDE | [1999/02] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/02] | 21.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 26.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 03.04.2003 | [2004/02] | Cited in | International search | [A]US4355367 (MASUZAWA SHIGEAKI ET AL) [A] 1-9 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]US4754680 (MORIKAWA SHIGENORI ET AL) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]US5086685 (HANZAWA HOHTARO ET AL) [A] 1-9 * figure 16B * |