EP0914078 - THE USE OF L-LYSINE IN THE TREATMENT OF HAIR LOSS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bio-Scientific Limited 24 Harmont House, 20 Harley Street London W1N 1AN / GB | [1999/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUSHTON, David, Hugh Frogmoor Cottage, 61 Harefield Road Rickmansworth, Hertfordshire WD3 1LZ / GB | [1999/19] | Representative(s) | Andrews, Timothy Stephen Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/19] | Andrews, Timothy Stephen Marks & Clerk, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 97925169.1 | 06.06.1997 | [1999/19] | WO1997GB01542 | Priority number, date | GB19960012108 | 10.06.1996 Original published format: GB 9612108 | [1999/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9747276 | Date: | 18.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/54] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0914078 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0914078 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/06 | [1999/19] | CPC: |
A61Q7/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/198 (EP,US);
A61K31/505 (EP,US);
A61K31/57 (EP,US);
A61K31/585 (EP,US);
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/505, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/505, A61K31/195 (US,EP);
A61K31/57, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/57, A61K31/195 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/19] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON LYSIN ZUR BEHANDLUNG DES HAARAUSFALLS | [1999/19] | English: | THE USE OF L-LYSINE IN THE TREATMENT OF HAIR LOSS | [1999/19] | French: | UTILISATION DE L-LYSINE DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE LA PERTE DES CHEVEUX | [1999/19] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/19] | 18.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS60142908 ; | [A]US3778502 (AUBIN G, et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 58 - line 67; claim 1 *; | [DA]DE3118882 (NORONHA RUDOLF V DR RER NAT DI) [DA] 4 * claims 1,2 *; | [X]FR2609393 (SEROBIOLOGIQUES LAB SA [FR]) [X] 1,4 * page 6, line 15 - line 19; claims 1,2 *; | [DA]DE4012148 (STUECKLER ERWIN [DE]) [DA] 4; | [A]FR2669224 (CONTIER MARCEL) [A] 4 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]US5122369 (DYE R HARVEY [US]) [A] 4 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0571198 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1,4 * claims 1,15,16 *; | [PX]EP0747035 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [PX] 1,4* claims 1,2 *; | [X] - U. PRUSIEWICZ-WITASZEK, "Changes in the synthesis of keratin in the hair after supplementing the basic feed of rabbits with methionine and lysine", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19750818), vol. 83, no. 7, Database accession no. 57121h, page 368, XP002038165 [X] 1,4 * abstract * | [ ] - POL. ARCH. WETER., (1975), vol. 17, no. 4, pages 659 - 666 | [A] - "Hair tonic compsn. - comprising water-soluble salt of dehydroepi-androsterone sulphate", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 85, no. 36, Database accession no. 85-220782, XP002038166 & JPS60142908 A 19850729 (KANEBO) [A] 1,4,12 * abstract * |