Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001509227 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9703794 | 16.07.1997 | DE19628740 | 17.07.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0912823 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2000 | B1 | EP0912823 | 06.05.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9703794 | 16.07.1997 | DE19628740 | 17.07.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59702824D1 | 01.02.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP9703794 | 16.07.1997 | DE19628740 | 17.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9803784 | Global Dossier | 29.01.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19628740 | 17.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19628740 | 22.01.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19628740 | 17.07.1996 |