EP0912823 - METHOD OF CONTROLLING INJECTION IN A HIGH-SPEED TWO-STROKE INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT THIS METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dolmar GmbH Jenfelder Strasse 38 22045 Hamburg / DE | [1999/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BISCHOFF, Dietmar Hauptstrasse 5 D-98530 Oberstadt / DE | 02 /
KLARE, Hartmut Haftalstrasse 7 D-98554 Benshausen / DE | 03 /
SINGER, Andreas Werdauer Strasse 22 D-08427 Fraureuth / DE | 04 /
SCHÖNHAAR, Jochen Lottestrasse 41 D-22529 Hamburg / DE | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | Richter, Werdermann & Gerbaulet Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97934469.4 | 16.07.1997 | [1999/18] | WO1997EP03794 | Priority number, date | DE1996128740 | 17.07.1996 Original published format: DE 19628740 | [1999/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9803784 | Date: | 29.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0912823 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0912823 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/34, F02D37/02 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
F02D41/009 (EP);
F02D37/02 (EP);
F02D41/266 (EP);
F02D41/345 (EP);
F02B2075/025 (EP);
F02D2400/04 (EP);
Y02T10/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT, SE [1999/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN DER EINSPRITZUNG EINER SCHNELLAUFENDEN ZWEITAKT-BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [1999/18] | English: | METHOD OF CONTROLLING INJECTION IN A HIGH-SPEED TWO-STROKE INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT THIS METHOD | [1999/18] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE L'INJECTION D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE DEUX TEMPS RAPIDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE METTRE LEDIT PROCEDE EN OEUVRE | [1999/18] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 18.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.06.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 27.12.2000 | [2002/23] | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5476082 (CARPENTER TODD L [US], et al) [Y] 1,3,4,8-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0494467 (DELCO ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [Y] 1,3,4,8-10 * column 1, line 40 - line 55 * * column 3, line 18 - line 52 * * column 6, line 14 - line 43 * * column 8, line 40 - line 53 *; | [A]US5329907 (NONAKA KIMIHIRO [JP]) [A] 1,3 * column 2, line 64 - line 68 * * column 5, line 27 - line 36 * * column 6, line 9 - line 27 * * column 7, line 17 - column 8, line 59 *; | [A]FR2578337 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 4,11 * the whole document *; | [A]US5392753 (BURSON BOB O [US], et al); | [A]US5325835 (KIMATA RYUICHI [JP], et al) |