Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0932748
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
14.11.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] |
22.11.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 08.01.2003 [2003/02] |
25.10.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.07.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
24.07.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.07.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.06.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
20.07.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.07.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
01.06.2001 |
First examination report |
|
28.05.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.07.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.07.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.06.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.08.1999 [1999/31] |
18.06.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.08.1999 [1999/31] |
16.06.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.03.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.03.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.03.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.06.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.05.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.02.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.09.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|